California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1899 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2012

Amended

Bill April 9, 2012
Bill March 20, 2012