|
02/01/2012
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
|
01/09/2012
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 22).
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P. & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/24/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on W., P. & W. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|