06/27/2012 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/26/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). | |||
06/07/2012 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
05/29/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/29/2012 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 5050.). | |||
05/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/16/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/03/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/02/2012 | Read second time and amended. | |||
05/01/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 25). | |||
04/09/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
03/29/2012 | Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/23/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. | |||
02/22/2012 | Read first time. To print. |