California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1904 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/20/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1904CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 399 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 20, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 20, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 23, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 27, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 12, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Block, Butler, and Cook FEBRUARY 22, 2012 An act to add Section 115.5 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1904, Block. Professions and vocations: military spouses: expedited licensure. Existing law provides for the licensure and regulation of various professions and vocations by boards within the Department of Consumer Affairs. Existing law provides for the issuance of reciprocal licenses in certain fields where the applicant, among other requirements, has a license to practice within that field in another jurisdiction, as specified. Existing law authorizes a licensee to reinstate an expired license without examination or penalty if, among other requirements, the license expired while the licensee was on active duty as a member of the California National Guard or the United States Armed Forces. This bill would require a board within the department to expedite the licensure process for an applicant who holds a license in the same profession or vocation in another jurisdiction and is married to, or in a legal union with, an active duty member of the Armed Forces of the United States who is assigned to a duty station in California under official active duty military orders. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 115.5 is added to the Business and Professions Code, to read: 115.5. (a) A board within the department shall expedite the licensure process for an applicant who meets both of the following requirements: (1) Supplies evidence satisfactory to the board that the applicant is married to, or in a domestic partnership or other legal union with, an active duty member of the Armed Forces of the United States who is assigned to a duty station in this state under official active duty military orders. (2) Holds a current license in another state, district, or territory of the United States in the profession or vocation for which he or she seeks a license from the board. (b) A board may adopt regulations necessary to administer this section.