LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1907
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1907
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1907
Compare Versions
AB1907 Chaptered September 30, 2012
AB1907 Enrolled September 6, 2012
AB1907 Amended August 6, 2012
AB1907 Amended June 19, 2012
AB1907 Amended May 25, 2012
AB1907 Amended April 9, 2012
AB1907 Introduced February 22, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1907 Chaptered September 30, 2012
AB1907 Enrolled September 6, 2012
AB1907 Amended August 6, 2012
AB1907 Amended June 19, 2012
AB1907 Amended May 25, 2012
AB1907 Amended April 9, 2012
AB1907 Introduced February 22, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare