05/14/2012 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Held under submission. | |||
04/16/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |||
04/11/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
04/10/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/09/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/05/2012 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
02/23/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. | |||
02/22/2012 | Read first time. To print. |