LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1916
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1916
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1916
Compare Versions
AB1916 Chaptered July 17, 2012
AB1916 Enrolled July 2, 2012
AB1916 Amended May 3, 2012
AB1916 Amended April 26, 2012
AB1916 Amended April 9, 2012
AB1916 Amended March 29, 2012
AB1916 Introduced February 22, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1916 Chaptered July 17, 2012
AB1916 Enrolled July 2, 2012
AB1916 Amended May 3, 2012
AB1916 Amended April 26, 2012
AB1916 Amended April 9, 2012
AB1916 Amended March 29, 2012
AB1916 Introduced February 22, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare