06/27/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/14/2012 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
06/04/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/31/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 24. Page 5179.) | |||
05/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/09/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/24/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/23/2012 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/19/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (April 17). | |||
04/11/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
04/10/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/23/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. | |||
02/22/2012 | Read first time. To print. |