08/16/2012 | In committee: Held under submission. | |||
06/25/2012 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
06/12/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/26/2012 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |||
04/23/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/23/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4488.) | |||
04/19/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/18/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 18). | |||
03/27/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |||
02/23/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. | |||
02/22/2012 | Read first time. To print. |