|
06/19/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 23. Page 5195.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 6.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|