LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1949
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1949
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1949
Action History
05/02/2012
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
04/26/2012
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
04/25/2012
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
03/15/2012
Re-referred to Com. on INS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
03/08/2012
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
02/24/2012
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
02/23/2012
Read first time. To print.