California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1955 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/26/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1955CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 581 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 26, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 26, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 20, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 22, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 21, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Block FEBRUARY 23, 2012 An act to add Section 66303 to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1955, Block. Public postsecondary education: campus law enforcement agency and student liaison. Existing law prohibits the Regents of the University of California, the Trustees of the California State University, and the governing board of a community college district from making or enforcing a rule subjecting a student to disciplinary sanction solely on the basis of conduct that is speech or other communication that is protected by specified provisions of the United States Constitution and the California Constitution. This bill would require, for purposes of promoting peaceful campus demonstrations, the Trustees of the California State University to require each campus of the California State University to designate an individual to serve as a liaison between campus law enforcement agencies and students exercising rights guaranteed by the First Amendment to the United States Constitution or a similar provision of the California Constitution, or both. The bill would request that the Regents of the University of California designate an individual at each campus of the University of California to serve as a liaison between campus law enforcement agencies and students exercising rights guaranteed by the First Amendment to the United States Constitution or a similar provision of the California Constitution, or both. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 66303 is added to the Education Code, to read: 66303. For purposes of promoting peaceful campus demonstrations, the Trustees of the California State University shall require each campus of the California State University to designate an individual to serve as a liaison between campus law enforcement agencies and students exercising rights guaranteed by the First Amendment to the United States Constitution or Section 2 of Article I of the California Constitution, or both. The Regents of the University of California are requested to designate an individual at each campus of the University of California to serve as a liaison between campus law enforcement agencies and students exercising rights guaranteed by the First Amendment to the United States Constitution or Section 2 of Article I of the California Constitution, or both.