|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 861, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 6309.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 4694.).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 25. Page 4595.)
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|