08/16/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
08/08/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/25/2012 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
05/17/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/16/2012 | Read second time and amended. | |||
05/15/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (May 14). | |||
04/09/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |||
03/27/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
03/26/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Read first time. To print. |