06/26/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
04/26/2012 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
04/23/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/23/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4491.) | |||
04/18/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
04/17/2012 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 16). | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Read first time. To print. |