|
08/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 195, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:10 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5836.).
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4286.).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4374.)
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|