|
09/14/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 318, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 4740.).
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 31. Page 4715.)
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|