California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1990 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill August 21, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 26, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill May 10, 2012
Bill May 1, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012