08/16/2012 | In committee: Held under submission. | |||
08/06/2012 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
06/27/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/14/2012 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
05/31/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/30/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 5093.) | |||
05/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/16/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/01/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/30/2012 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/26/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 24). | |||
04/19/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Read first time. To print. |