|
10/04/2011
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 14. Page 2901.).
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2195.).
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 18. Page 1504.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 27.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|