06/18/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | |||
06/11/2012 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |||
05/31/2012 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
05/17/2012 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |||
05/03/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/03/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 4663.) | |||
04/26/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 24). | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Read first time. To print. |