California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2005 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 20, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill May 1, 2012
Bill April 10, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012