05/25/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
04/25/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
03/29/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/15/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
03/14/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Read first time. To print. |