LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2009
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2009
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2009
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 23, 2012
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
August 29, 2012
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
September 22, 2012
Compare
Amended
Bill
August 16, 2012
Compare
Bill
June 20, 2012
Compare
Bill
May 31, 2012
Compare
Bill
May 3, 2012
Compare
Bill
April 16, 2012
Compare
Bill
March 29, 2012
Compare
Bill
March 19, 2012
Compare