|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 641, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 4759.).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 10. Page 4768.)
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|