LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB202
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB202
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB202
Compare Versions
AB202 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB202 Amended August 15, 2011
AB202 Amended June 28, 2011
AB202 Amended May 16, 2011
AB202 Amended April 15, 2011
AB202 Amended March 25, 2011
AB202 Introduced January 27, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB202 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB202 Amended August 15, 2011
AB202 Amended June 28, 2011
AB202 Amended May 16, 2011
AB202 Amended April 15, 2011
AB202 Amended March 25, 2011
AB202 Introduced January 27, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare