06/07/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/29/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/29/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 5054.) | |||
05/25/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/14/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. | |||
05/10/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
05/09/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 8). | |||
04/17/2012 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/10/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Read first time. To print. |