|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 841, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6795.) Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 5. Page 6798.).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 5053.).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 29).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. Joint Rule 61(b)(15) suspended. (Page 4911.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4911.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Page 4844.) Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 4. Page 5962.)
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|