|
09/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 747, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 4. Page 4741.).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 6).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 5086.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4973.)
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|