08/16/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
08/08/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/25/2012 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
05/15/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/15/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |||
05/07/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
05/03/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/17/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
03/12/2012 | Re-referred to Coms. on J., E.D. & E. and REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Read first time. To print. |