08/16/2012 | In committee: Held under submission. | |||
08/06/2012 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
06/28/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/14/2012 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |||
05/31/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/30/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 5094.) | |||
05/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/18/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
03/29/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Read first time. To print. |