LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2041
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2041
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2041
Compare Versions
AB2041 Chaptered September 28, 2012
AB2041 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB2041 Amended August 15, 2012
AB2041 Amended June 12, 2012
AB2041 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB2041 Chaptered September 28, 2012
AB2041 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB2041 Amended August 15, 2012
AB2041 Amended June 12, 2012
AB2041 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare