06/26/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/12/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/22/2012 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
04/30/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/30/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 4596.) | |||
04/26/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 25). | |||
04/10/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Read first time. To print. |