|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 817, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 4869.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 25. Page 5179.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (May 14).
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|