|
09/24/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 510, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 4470.).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4921.)
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|