|
09/29/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 28. Page 6490.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 4586.).
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 4283.)
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 27. Page 4676.)
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|