07/03/2012 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |||
06/20/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
05/24/2012 | Re-referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and PUB. S. | |||
05/17/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/07/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/07/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4702.) | |||
04/19/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/18/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
04/17/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 16). | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Read first time. To print. |