02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
04/25/2011 | In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |||
04/04/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/25/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
03/24/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
01/28/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 27. | |||
01/27/2011 | Read first time. To print. |