California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2060 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill July 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill August 17, 2012

Amended

Bill August 7, 2012
Bill April 30, 2012