|
07/02/2012
|
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 8. Page 4924.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 24).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Com. on W., P. & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P. & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|