BILL NUMBER: AB 2068CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 748 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 29, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 29, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 20, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 22, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 14, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 26, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 21, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 9, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Portantino (Coauthors: Assembly Members Cook and Jeffries) (Coauthors: Senators Cannella, Dutton, and Rubio) FEBRUARY 23, 2012 An act to amend and repeal Section 5002.8 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2068, Portantino. Vehicles: license plates: legislative and congressional members. Existing law authorizes the Department of Motor Vehicles to issue distinctive license plates for a motor vehicle owned by a current or retired Member of the California Legislature and a Member of the Congress of the United States and requires that the person pay additional fees in addition to the regular fees for an original registration or renewal of registration. Existing law establishes the California Environmental License Plate Fund in the State Treasury and requires, after certain moneys are deducted by the Controller, that the balance of the moneys in the fund be available for expenditure for specific trust purposes. This bill would, beginning January 1, 2014, (1) make the additional fees for these distinctive license plates the same as the fees paid by an applicant for a personalized license plate, (2) make the Member subject to a transfer fee for these distinctive license plates, and (3) require the department to deposit in the California Environmental License Plate Fund all fees received by the department in payment for the issuance, renewal, or transfer of the special license plates authorized under these provisions after the department deducts its costs in administering these provisions. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 5002.8 of the Vehicle Code is amended to read: 5002.8. (a) A distinctive license plate issued for a motor vehicle owned by a current or retired Member of the California Legislature, which plate denotes that the person is, or was, a Member of the Legislature, and a distinctive license plate issued for a vehicle owned by a Member of the Congress of the United States, which plate denotes that the person is a Member of Congress, shall require fees. (b) In addition to the regular fees for an original registration or renewal of registration, the following special fees shall be paid: (1) Twelve dollars ($12) for the initial issuance of such special plate. (2) Ten dollars ($10) for the transfer of such plate to another motor vehicle. (c) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2014, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2014, deletes or extends that date. SEC. 2. Section 5002.8 of the Vehicle Code is amended to read: 5002.8. (a) (1) Distinctive license plates issued for a motor vehicle owned by a current or retired Member of the California Legislature, which plates denote that the person is, or was, a Member of the Legislature, and distinctive license plates issued for a vehicle owned by a Member of the Congress of the United States, which plates denote that the person is a Member of Congress, shall be subject to the regular fees for an original registration or renewal of registration. (2) In addition to the regular fees for an original registration or renewal of registration, the applicant shall be charged the following additional fees: (b) For an original registration, the applicant shall be charged the fee specified in subdivision (a) of Section 5106. (c) For a renewal of registration, the applicant shall be charged the fee specified in subdivision (b) of Section 5106. (d) When a Member or former Member of the California Legislature or a Member of the Congress of the United States who has been issued personalized license plates pursuant to this section applies to the department for transfer of the plates to another passenger vehicle, commercial motor vehicle, trailer, or semitrailer, a transfer fee in the amount specified pursuant to Section 5108 shall be charged in addition to all other appropriate fees. (e) After deducting the costs incurred by the department to administer this section, the department shall deposit in the California Environmental License Plate Fund, all fees received by the department in payment for the issuance, renewal, or transfer of the special license plates authorized under this section. (f) This section shall become operative on January 1, 2014.