California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2069 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2012

Amended

Bill May 24, 2012
Bill April 10, 2012