|
10/03/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 435, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 29. Page 2650.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2007.).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 23. Page 1037.)
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (March 30).
|
|
|
|
02/01/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|