|
09/14/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 320, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6312.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4707.).
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4985.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|