|
08/13/2012
|
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4819.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 7).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|