|
07/13/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 123, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:20 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4225.).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4569.)
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|