|
08/31/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 11. Noes 25. Page 5093.)
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 16. Noes 20. Page 5034.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Calderon. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5034.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (August 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4316.) In committee: Reconsideration granted. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 4. Page 4925.)
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4547.) From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|