California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2082 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 20, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2012

Amended

Bill June 21, 2012
Bill April 19, 2012
Bill April 10, 2012