05/15/2012 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
04/17/2012 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage. | |||
04/11/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
04/10/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/27/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Read first time. To print. |