LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2091
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2091
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2091
Action History
07/03/2012
From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
04/24/2012
In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
04/17/2012
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
03/08/2012
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
02/24/2012
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
02/23/2012
Read first time. To print.